This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:48:24 (UTC).

Coastal Partners II, LLC v. City of Cranston et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Coastal Partners II, LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Cranston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mary S. McElroy and Patricia A. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary S. McElroy

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coastal Partners II, LLC

Defendants

City of Cranston

David Capuano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Clark Corrente

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Christopher N. Dawson

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

Marc DeSisto

Attorney at DeSisto Law LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal - State Court

1 #3

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by David Capuano, City of Cranston.(DeSisto, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#7

(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 4/27/2022; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 5/27/2022; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/27/2022; Expert Discovery to close by 7/27/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/27/2021. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 4/27/2022; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 5/27/2022; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/27/2022; Expert Discovery to close by 7/27/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2022. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 10/27/2021. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketHEARING CANCELLED : Rule 16 Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 12:00 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy is hereby cancelled. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 12:00 PM in Remote Hearing before District Judge Mary S. McElroy.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 980 7710, Passcode: 818105) (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by David Capuano, City of Cranston.(DeSisto, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-05607. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1667616, filed by City of Cranston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Mary S. McElroy and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Marc DeSisto on behalf of All Defendants (DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2021-05607. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ARIDC-1667616, filed by City of Cranston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSisto, Marc) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. DeSisto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc DeSisto