This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 09:18:43 (UTC).

Coalition for TJ v. Fairfax County School Board et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Coalition for TJ filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Fairfax County School Board. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00296

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Coalition for TJ

Defendants

Dr. Scott Braband

Fairfax County School Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alison Elisabeth Somin

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

3100 Clarendon Boulevard, Suite 610

Arlington, VA 22201

Defendant Attorneys

Stuart Alan Raphael

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

2200 Pennsyvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Sona Rewari

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

2200 Pennsyvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20037

 

Court Documents

24 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2, Declaration of Jeremy Shughart

24 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1, Minutes of FCSB Meeting (Dec. 17, 2020)

#24

(#24) Opposition to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Minutes of FCSB Meeting (Dec. 17, 2020), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Declaration of Jeremy Shughart)(Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#23

(#23) Notice of Hearing Date set for May 21, 2021 re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

22 #4

Exhibit Ex. 4, Declaration of Cynthia C. Smoot

22 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3, First Am. Compl., KC v. FCSB

22 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1, FCSB Board Minutes (Dec. 17, 2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#15

(#17) Notice of Hearing Date re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

7 #1

Notice

#7

(#7) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Glenn E. Roper and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7666851. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin E. Wilcox and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7665901. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Kieser and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7665681. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Opposition to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, Minutes of FCSB Meeting (Dec. 17, 2020), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Declaration of Jeremy Shughart)(Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Notice of Hearing Date set for May 21, 2021 re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Brief in Support to #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, FCSB Board Minutes (Dec. 17, 2020), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, FCPS Reg. 3355.14 (Apr. 28, 2021), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, First Am. Compl., KC v. FCSB, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, Declaration of Cynthia C. Smoot)(Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Waiver of re #18 Consent MOTION to Stay Issuance of the Scheduling Order Pending Disposition of Dispositive Motions -- Waiver of Hearing by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Brief in Support to #18 Consent MOTION to Stay Issuance of the Scheduling Order Pending Disposition of Dispositive Motions filed by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Consent MOTION to Stay Issuance of the Scheduling Order Pending Disposition of Dispositive Motions by Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Raphael, Stuart) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Hearing Date re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Coalition for TJ as to Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coalition for TJ. Dr. Scott Braband waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021; Fairfax County School Board waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Dr. Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Glenn E. Roper and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7666851. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin E. Wilcox and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7665901. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Kieser and Certification of Local Counsel Alison E. Somin Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7665681. by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Coalition for TJ. (Somin, Alison) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Fairfax County School Board, Dr. Scott Brabrand and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7665331.), filed by Coalition for TJ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Somin, Alison) Modified text on 3/11/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRFAX COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD is a litigant