This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 10:51:25 (UTC).

COAKLEY v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 COAKLEY filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-19287

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANICE COAKLEY

Defendants

MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.

TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED

ASTRAZENECA LP

PFIZER, INC

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.

WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

WYETH LLC

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVI M. PLESSET

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

JEFFREY R. LILLY

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY R. LILLY on behalf of TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (LILLY, JEFFREY) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 12/15/20, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II). (jc, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (jc, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jc, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PFIZER, INC, TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11822528) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JANICE COAKLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PLESSET, LEVI) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES is a litigant

Latest cases where WYETH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. is a litigant