Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 07:48:48 (UTC).

Coachman v. Home SFR Borrower IV LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Coachman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01125

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tojayla Vashun Coachman

Intervenor Plaintiff

LaQuonna Coachman-Hall

Defendants

Home SFR Borrower IV LLC

Havenbrook Homes LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlivear "Carl Korehn Bryant

Attorney at CORY WATSON ATTORNEYS, PC

2131 Magnolia Avenue, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

James Curtis Tanner

Attorney at CORY WATSON, P.C.

2131 Magnolia Avenue South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Douglas A Dellaccio, Jr

Attorney at CORY WATSON PC

2131 Magnolia Avenue South, Suite 200, P O Box 55927

Birmingham, AL 35255-5972

Hirlye Ray Lutz, III

Attorney at CORY WATSON CROWDER & DEGARIS

2131 Magnolia Avenue

Birmingham, AL 35205

Frank Jerome Tapley

Attorney at CORY WATSON, P.C.

2131 Magnolia Avenue, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35205

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Edward LeMoine

Attorney at TURNBULL LAW FIRM

2 20Th St. N. Suite 1600

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Leon A Boyd, V

Attorney at COBB BOYD WHITE & COBB

112 Jamestown Blvd, P O Box 2047

Dothan, AL 36302

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re #16 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Herring, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#17

(#17) Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Letters of Administration

#16

(#16) First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#15

(#15) REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

11 #2

Exhibit Ex B

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B)(Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Hirlye Ray Lutz, III on behalf of Tojayla Vashun Coachman (Lutz, Hirlye) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jerome Tapley on behalf of Tojayla Vashun Coachman (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER LaQuonna Coachman-Hall's Motion to Intervene #5 is SET for a hearing at 3:00 p.m. on 8/6/2019 at the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama. Any briefs in support of or in opposition to the motion are due by 4:30 p.m. on 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#5

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#4

(#4) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/23/2019. (KSS) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 4:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/22/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC.(Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home SFR Borrower IV LLC, Havenbrook Homes LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-902628.00., filed by Home SFR Borrower IV LLC, Havenbrook Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AFS) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint re #16 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Herring, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPLY Brief filed by Defendants Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC re: #14 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Abdul K Kallon: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2019 re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by LaQuonna Coachman-Hall. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (KSS) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Before the court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing #11 . Plaintiff's response is due 8/14/2019, defendants' reply, if any, is due 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/5/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by LaQuonna Coachman-Hall. (LeMoine, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B)(Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tojayla Vashun Coachman. (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Hirlye Ray Lutz, III on behalf of Tojayla Vashun Coachman (Lutz, Hirlye) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Jerome Tapley on behalf of Tojayla Vashun Coachman (Tapley, Frank) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER LaQuonna Coachman-Hall's Motion to Intervene #5 is SET for a hearing at 3:00 p.m. on 8/6/2019 at the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama. Any briefs in support of or in opposition to the motion are due by 4:30 p.m. on 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Intervene by LaQuonna Coachman-Hall. (LeMoine, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/23/2019. (KSS) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 4:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00 AM; BOTH in the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/22/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Filing Fee:$400, receipt_number 1126-3394695 (ALND B 4601099276) (Boyd, Leon) Modified on 7/22/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Havenbrook Homes LLC, Home SFR Borrower IV LLC.(Boyd, Leon) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • NOTICE of Appearance by Carlivear "Carli" Korehn Bryant on behalf of Tojayla Vashun Coachman deemed filed on 6/14/2019 in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama. Page 26 of Exhibit A (AFS) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home SFR Borrower IV LLC, Havenbrook Homes LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-CV-2019-902628.00., filed by Home SFR Borrower IV LLC, Havenbrook Homes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AFS) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Havenbrook Homes RHA-2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Home SFR Borrower LLC is a litigant