This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 08:43:49 (UTC).

CMI Roadbuilding Inc v. Wiregrass Construction Company Inc

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 CMI Roadbuilding Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00832

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMI Roadbuilding Inc

Defendant

Wiregrass Construction Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cary E Hiltgen

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Jeff C Grotta

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Rachal A Brown

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Rachal A Lisle

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron James Pruss

Attorney at Becker & Poliakoff, PA

12140 Carissa Commerce Court, Suite 200

Fort Myers, FL 33966

Lauren B Hanna

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC-101-OKC

101 N Robinson Ave, 13Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support filed by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Tim Owens

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support filed by CMI Roadbuilding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tim Owens)(Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Seal Document by CMI Roadbuilding Inc. (Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#13

(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc . (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron J. Pruss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Exh 1 - BTJ Request for PHV

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3259446 by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - BTJ Request for PHV)(Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exh 1-AJP Request for PHV

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3259421 by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1-AJP Request for PHV)(Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren B Hanna on behalf of Wiregrass Construction Company Inc (Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachal A Brown on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Brown, Rachal) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff C Grotta on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CMI Roadbuilding Inc . (Hiltgen, Cary) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Cary E Hiltgen on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Hiltgen, Cary) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support filed by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support filed by CMI Roadbuilding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tim Owens)(Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Seal Document by CMI Roadbuilding Inc. (Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc . (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue, with Brief in Support by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Pruss, Aaron) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron J. Pruss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/4/2020. (mb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3259446 by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - BTJ Request for PHV)(Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3259421 by Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1-AJP Request for PHV)(Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren B Hanna on behalf of Wiregrass Construction Company Inc (Hanna, Lauren) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachal A Brown on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Brown, Rachal) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff C Grotta on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Grotta, Jeff) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CMI Roadbuilding Inc . (Hiltgen, Cary) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Cary E Hiltgen on behalf of CMI Roadbuilding Inc (Hiltgen, Cary) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3233345. (Hiltgen, Cary) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Wiregrass Construction Company Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wiregrass Construction Company Inc filed by CMI Roadbuilding Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposal P161822-1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sales Agreement 15017, #3 Exhibit 3 - Invoice 14905, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Account 1854301A, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposal P161728, #6 Exhibit 6 - Invoice 16176, #7 Exhibit 7 - Invoice 16444, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less