This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:06:50 (UTC).

CMG Worldwide, Inc. v. Dreams Fulfilled, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 CMG Worldwide, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dreams Fulfilled, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CMG Worldwide, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant

Dreams Fulfilled, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants

The Estate of Jackie Robinson

Rachel Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Azadeh Sinai

Attorney at CMG Worldwide Inc

9229 Sunset Boulevard Suite 950

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Theodore J Minch

Attorney at Sovich Minch LLP

445 North Pennsylvania Suite 405

Indianapolis, IN 46204

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Richard J Mooney

Attorney at Rimon PC

One Embarcadero Ctr. #400

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case No.: 19STLC00037. (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#24

(#24) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the action is hereby remanded to state court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J Minch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc., designating Azadeh Sinai as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#22

(#22) Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #11 filed by Counterclaim Defendant CMG Worldwide, Inc..(Sinai, Azadeh) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#20

(#20) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. #16 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken (yl) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

19 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear

#19

(#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23330983) filed by plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sinai, Azadeh) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

16 #3

Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

#11

(#22) Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #11 filed by Counterclaim Defendant CMG Worldwide, Inc..(Sinai, Azadeh) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#6

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 02/14/2019. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#5

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 02/14/2019. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, identifying Jay Caldwell. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

1 #3

Declaration OF RICHARD MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC NOT

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Secretary of State website page

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STLC00037 Receipt No: 0973-23206409 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Secretary of State website page, #3 Declaration OF RICHARD MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attorney Richard J Mooney added to party Dreams Fulfilled, LLC(pty:dft))(Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case No.: 19STLC00037. (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Remanding Action to State Court by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the action is hereby remanded to state court for all further proceedings. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J Minch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc., designating Azadeh Sinai as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #11 filed by Counterclaim Defendant CMG Worldwide, Inc..(Sinai, Azadeh) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • (#21) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4.2, counsel for plaintiff shall immediately submit the proposed order in connection with Docket Entry 19 (to the Judges generic email address) in Word or Word Perfect format. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. #16 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The document is stricken (yl) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23330983) filed by plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Sinai, Azadeh) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #14 as to Third Party Defendants Rachel Robinson, The Estate of Jackie Robinson. (shb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. No. 0973-23330983) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. Declaration of Theodore Minch cites California Rules of Court and does not cite FRCP or Local Rules. PHV application does not require declarations. Failed to use court's Proposed Order. (lt) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT, SEE DE 20] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Theodore J. Minch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 3/6/2019, Receipt No. No. 0973-23330983) filed by Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #2 Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, #3 Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE) (Sinai, Azadeh) Modified on 3/13/2019 (yl). (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 02/15/19. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 02/14/2019. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff CMG Worldwide, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/13/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC, identifying Jay Caldwell. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC. (Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STLC00037 Receipt No: 0973-23206409 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Dreams Fulfilled, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Secretary of State website page, #3 Declaration OF RICHARD MOONEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attorney Richard J Mooney added to party Dreams Fulfilled, LLC(pty:dft))(Mooney, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMG Worldwide Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore J. Minch