This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2020 at 13:21:27 (UTC).

CMBS LLC et al v. AUTEN

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 CMBS LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AUTEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CMBS LLC

FISH GAME KINGS

NLG SOFTWARE, LLC

Defendant

ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN W. TRAPP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES D. WILLIAMS, JR.

3200 Croasdaile Dr., Ste. 604

Durham, NC 27705

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER J. GEIS

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Registered Agent Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Consent Form

#6

#7

#8

#9

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Rescheduling: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/29/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Response to Motion due by 4/6/2020 by KEVIN L. AUTEN.(GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/18/2020 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #3 Complaint by KEVIN L. AUTEN. (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case Number 20CVS134, issued 1/21/2020 and listed as Attachment 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN, filed by CMBS LLC, NLG SOFTWARE, LLC, FISH GAME KINGS. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case Number 20CVS134 and listed as Attachment 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. GEIS on behalf of Defendant SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CMBS LLC, FISH GAME KINGS, NLG SOFTWARE, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2736405), filed by SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Registered Agent Documents) (GEIS, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROWAN COUNTY SHERIFF KEVIN L. AUTEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER J. GEIS