This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/26/2020 at 07:59:41 (UTC).

Club Bo A36 LLC et al v. Alpine Airpark Association Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Club Bo A36 LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Alpine Airpark Association Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark L Carman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00244

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark L Carman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Club Bo A36 LLC

Francesco Chierici

Defendants

Alpine Airpark Association Inc

Alpine Airpark Refuge Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan O Hafen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Bryan S Johansen

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Dino G Moncecchi

Attorney at HARRIS KARSTEADT JAMISON & POWERS

10333 East Dry Creek Road, Suite 300

Englewood, CO 80112

Andrew James Carafelli

Attorney at HARRIS KARSTEADT JAMISON & POWERS

10333 East Dry Creek Road, Suite 300

Englewood, CO 80112

Thomas A Thompson

Attorney at MacPHERSON KELLY & THOMPSON

616 West Buffalo Street, P O Box 999

Rawlins, WY 82301

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re: Defendant Alpine Airpark Association, Incs S

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

6 #2

Proposed Order -Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Bryan Johansen)

6 #1

Exhibit A-Declaration of Bryan S. Johansen in Support of Motion for Admission Pr

#6

1 #3

Magistrate Consent Form

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Alpine Airpark Refuge Inc. (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Alpine Airpark Refuge Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Alpine Airpark Association Inc. (Carafelli, Andrew) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dino G Moncecchi on behalf of Alpine Airpark Association Inc (Moncecchi, Dino) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 1/24/2020. (Court Staff, skw) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 1/24/2020. (Court Staff, skw) Text modified on 1/9/2020 (Court Staff, skw). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of time to file Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Alpine Airpark Association Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re: Defendant Alpine Airpark Association, Incs Stipulated Motion For Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading To The Complaint)(Carafelli, Andrew) Text modified on 1/9/2020. (Court Staff, skw). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #6 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Bryan S. Johansen for Club Bo A36 LLC. (Court Staff, skw) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time To File Answer filed by Defendant Alpine Airpark Refuge Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Thompson on behalf of Alpine Airpark Refuge Inc (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fees for Bryan Johansen. Receipt CHY032317. (Court Staff, sjk) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Bryan Johansen to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Francesco Chierici, Club Bo A36 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Bryan S. Johansen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order -Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Bryan Johansen))(Hafen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew James Carafelli on behalf of Alpine Airpark Association Inc (Carafelli, Andrew) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • (#4) DISREGARD, COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE. MOTION for Bryan S. Johansen to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Francesco Chierici, Club Bo A36 LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Bryan S. Johansen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hafen, Jonathan) Modified on 1/8/2020 (Court Staff, skw). Modified on 1/9/2020 (Court Staff, skw). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Francesco Chierici, Club Bo A36 LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons to Alpine Airpark Refuge, Inc.) (Hafen, Jonathan) 1 summons issued and mailed to counsel on 12/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Francesco Chierici, Club Bo A36 LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons to Alpine Airpark Association, Inc.) (Hafen, Jonathan) 1 summons issued and mailed to counsel on 12/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Club Bo A36 LLC, Francesco Chierici (no summons(es) issued; Filing fee $400, receipt #CHY032078) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, sbh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2019: #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan S. Johansen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan O. Hafen