This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 08:39:26 (UTC).

Clobes v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Clobes filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against NBCUniversal Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patrick J. Schiltz and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-02117

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catelin Clobes

Defendants

NBCUniversal Media, LLC.

Brandy Zadrozny

Aliza Nadi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marjorie J Holsten

Attorney at Marjorie J. Holsten

9601 Annapolis Lane North

Maple Grove, MN 55369

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC., Aliza Nadi, Brandy Zadrozny. (CLK) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#6

(#6) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James G. Mermigis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9053075 filed by Catelin Clobes. (Holsten, Marjorie) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (NAH). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James G. Mermigis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9053075 filed by Catelin Clobes. (Holsten, Marjorie) Modified text on 10/22/2021 (NAH). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing James G. Mermigis as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to NBCUniversal Media, LLC., Aliza Nadi, Brandy Zadrozny. (CLK) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-2117 PJS/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC., Brandy Zadrozny filed by Catelin Clobes. (Holsten, Marjorie) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9043635) filed by Catelin Clobes. Filer requests summons issued. (Holsten, Marjorie) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBCUniversal Media, LLC is a litigant