This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:39:15 (UTC).

Cline v. Warden

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cline filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert L Miller, Jr and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01144

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nicholas Lee Cline

Westville, IN 46391

Respondent

Warden

Not Classified By Court

WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Duplicate copy of IFP DE [3]

#2

(#2) (unsigned) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicholas Lee Cline.(nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

5 #2

Affidavit of Jason Walls

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Petitioner Nicholas Lee Cline. (nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

#1

(#1) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Nicholas Lee Cline. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING Nicholas Lee Cline until 1/6/2020 to file a signed habeas corpus petition. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/9/2019. (bas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) RECEIPT of Duplicate copy of Consent form DE #1 from Nicholas Lee Cline. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate copy of IFP DE #3 )(nae) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Nicholas Lee Cline is GRANTED until 2/6/2020, to file a signed habeas corpus petition. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/15/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

5 #3

Letter

#5

(#5) (unsigned) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicholas Lee Cline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit of Jason Walls, #3 Letter)(nae) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Nicholas Lee Cline is GRANTED until 2/6/2020, to file a signed habeas corpus petition. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/15/2020. (lhc) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RECEIPT of Duplicate copy of Consent form DE #1 from Nicholas Lee Cline. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate copy of IFP DE #3 )(nae) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) (unsigned) Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicholas Lee Cline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Affidavit of Jason Walls, #3 Letter)(nae) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING Nicholas Lee Cline until 1/6/2020 to file a signed habeas corpus petition. He is CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/9/2019. (bas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Petitioner Nicholas Lee Cline. (nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) (unsigned) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nicholas Lee Cline.(nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Nicholas Lee Cline. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (nae) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.