This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 15:28:08 (UTC).

Jack Eric Cline v. Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 Jack Eric Cline filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08176

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Eric Cline

Defendants

Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.

Alta Hospitals System, LLC

Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.

Does 1-20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sam K Kim

Attorney at Verum Law Group APC

841 Apollo Street Suite 340

El Segundo, CA 90245

Yoonis J Han

Attorney at Verum Law Group APC

841 Apollo Street Suite 340

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Hering

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker, LLP

18575 Jamboree Road, Suite 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

Maria Z Stearns

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

1875 Jamboree Road 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline.(Kim, Sam) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#12

#11

#10

1 #13

Supplement Certificate of Service

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline.(Kim, Sam) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of Standing Order filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2021; Alta Hospitals System, LLC answer now due 11/19/2021; Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2021, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendant Southern California Healthcare System, Inc..(Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Alta Hospitals System, LLC served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline, upon Defendant Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2021 Submitted with Attachment 5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jack Eric Cline. Filed in State Court on 9/10/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/18/2021 (car). (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE of Certification and Notice of Interested Parties re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. (Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc. identifying Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Janine Yoshida re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV33420 Receipt No: ACACDC-32151465 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Alta Hospitals System, LLC, Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Supplement Certificate of Service) (Attorney Peter Hering added to party Alta Hospitals System, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Hering added to party Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Hering added to party Southern California Healthcare System, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hering, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. is a litigant