This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 13:19:50 (UTC).

Clifton v. Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Clifton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson L. Kiser and Robert S. Ballou. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00350

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jackson L. Kiser

Referral Judge

Robert S. Ballou

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Jack Clifton

Duffield, VA 24244

Defendant

Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11//2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#6

(#6) STRICKEN PER ORDER #7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Dewayne Helton.(ck) Modified on 8/10/2020 (tvt).

#5

(#5) Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 14 days. Responses due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/13/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

#4

(#4) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Jimmy Jack Clifton (ck)

#3

(#3) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Jimmy Jack Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ck)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 8/11//2020. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORAL ORDER: By order entered July 13, 2020, the court conditionally filed this action, directed Clifton to file an amended complaint, and enclosed a form for the amended complaint. See ECF No. 5. On July 29, 2020, the court received the first page of the form back, but it was submitted by another inmate and makes allegations which are both nonsensical and have nothing to do with this case. Inasmuch as the document was not submitted by Clifton and is unrelated to this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the document (ECF No. 6) is STRICKEN from the record of this case and will not be considered by the court.. Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 8/10/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STRICKEN PER ORDER #7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Dewayne Helton.(ck) Modified on 8/10/2020 (tvt).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 14 days. Responses due by 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/13/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Jimmy Jack Clifton (ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/18/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Jimmy Jack Clifton (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Duffield Regional Jail Medical Administrator, filed by Jimmy Jack Clifton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ck)

    Read MoreRead Less