This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 07:15:54 (UTC).

Clifford v. Illinois State Police et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Clifford filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Illinois State Police. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan B. Gottschall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00512

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan B. Gottschall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Athena Clifford

Defendants

Troy Booher

Illinois State Police

State of Illinois

Illinois Tollway

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey R. Kulwin

Attorney at Kulwin, Masciopinto & Kulwin, LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before April 2, 2021. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Ninth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/1/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Athena Clifford; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17875447. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before April 2, 2021. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Ninth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 2/1/2021. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Athena Clifford; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17875447. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey R. Kulwin