This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2020 at 09:48:54 (UTC).

Clifford Galloway et al v. D and M Carriers, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Clifford Galloway filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against D and M Carriers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00178

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clifford Galloway

Timothy Baker

Defendants

D and M Carriers, LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Norman B Blumenthal

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Aparajit Bhowmik

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Kyle R Nordrehaug

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Jeffrey Scott Herman

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

San Diego, CA 92037

Ricardo Ramon Ehmann

Attorney at Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Chad McNatt, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary LLP

2 North Lake Avenue Suite 560

Pasadena, CA 91101

James Anthony Eckhart

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

R Jay Taylor, Jr

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

James H Hanson

Attorney at Scopelitis Garvin Light Hanson and Feary PC

10 West Market Street Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James H. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC #8 : The Court, having determined whether the required fee has been paid, and having reviewed the Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by James H. Hanson for permission to appear and participate in this case on behalf of D and M Carriers, and designating as Local Counsel Christopher C. McNatt, Jr. HEREBY ORDERS THAT the Application be: GRANTED. (bm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Jay Taylor, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC #7 : The Court, having determined whether the required fee has been paid, and having reviewed the Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by R. Jay Taylor, Jr. for permission to appear and participate in this case on behalf of D and M Carriers, LLC, and designating as Local Counsel Christopher C. McNatt, Jr. HEREBY ORDERS THAT the Application be: GRANTED. (bm) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Timothy Baker, Clifford Galloway. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Ehmann, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ricardo Ramon Ehmann on behalf of Plaintiffs Timothy Baker, Clifford Galloway (Attorney Ricardo Ramon Ehmann added to party Timothy Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Ricardo Ramon Ehmann added to party Clifford Galloway(pty:pla))(Ehmann, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Plaintiffs Timothy Baker, Clifford Galloway (Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Timothy Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Scott Herman added to party Clifford Galloway(pty:pla))(Herman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James H. Hanson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25213544) filed by Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McNatt, Christopher) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney R. Jay Taylor, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25205984) filed by Defendant D and M Carriers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McNatt, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-00178 VAP (SPx). (esa) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendant D&M Carriers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Eckhart)(Eckhart, James) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant D&M Carriers, LLC, identifying OBS Holdings, LLC and David Freymiller. (Eckhart, James) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant D&M Carriers, LLC. (Eckhart, James) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1935995 Receipt No: 0973-25197192 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant D&M Carriers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Trish Tevlin, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Defendant's Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties and State Court Clerk) (Attorney James Anthony Eckhart added to party D&M Carriers, LLC (pty:dft))(Eckhart, James) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D & M Carriers, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Chad McNatt Jr.