This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:25 (UTC).

CLIFFORD et al v. ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CLIFFORD filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05720

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REBECCA RISBON

CRAIG CLIFFORD

Defendant

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSEPH A. ZENSTEIN

Attorney at CLAIMS WORLDWIDE LLC

Two Logan Square, 100 N 18Th St Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY

Attorney at ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY BUCKALEW LLC

1240 Old York Road, Suite 101

Warminster, PA 18974

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL K. LORENZ

Attorney at CURTIN & HEEFNER LLP

1040 Stony Hill Rd, Suite 150

Yardley, PA 19067

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 7/31/20, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 8/14/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/31/20. 1/31/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of CRAIG CLIFFORD, REBECCA RISBON (KOVALSKY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/31/2020 11:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS (ROOM 9613) BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH.(pc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

6 #2

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal with State Court by MICHAEL K. LORENZ on behalf of ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY(LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRAIG CLIFFORD, REBECCA RISBON. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 190902274. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207804)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT ALL FACTUAL DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 7/31/20, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 8/14/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/31/20. 1/31/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/31/20. (fdc, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY on behalf of CRAIG CLIFFORD, REBECCA RISBON (KOVALSKY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#8) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/31/2020 11:30 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS (ROOM 9613) BEFORE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH.(pc, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs or relief other than monetary damages is sought (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal with State Court by MICHAEL K. LORENZ on behalf of ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY(LORENZ, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRAIG CLIFFORD, REBECCA RISBON. (ZENSTEIN, JOSEPH) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 190902274. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207804)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.