This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:54:46 (UTC).

Cliff v. Smith (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Cliff filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Smith INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00603

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steve T. Cliff

Elmore, AL 36025

Defendant

Officer Smith

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Civil Appeals Checklist

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT: In accordance with the #6 memorandum opinion entered today, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) Plf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. no. #2 ) is denied. (3) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case. No costs are taxed. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is GRANTED; and 2) Plf is GRANTED an extension from 9/3/2020, to and including 10/5/2020, to file his objections, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/9/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the #3 Recommendation by Steve T. Cliff. (bes, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plf be DENIED; 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plf's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/20/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

2 #2

Affidavit

2 #1

IFP Declaration

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration, #2 Affidavit) (imm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Formal Complaint

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Smith, filed by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 Formal Complaint)(imm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT: In accordance with the #6 memorandum opinion entered today, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation (doc. no. #3 ) is adopted. (2) Plf's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. no. #2 ) is denied. (3) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case. No costs are taxed. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2020. (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo objections filed to the #3 recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that: 1) Plf's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is GRANTED; and 2) Plf is GRANTED an extension from 9/3/2020, to and including 10/5/2020, to file his objections, as further set out in order; Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/9/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to the #3 Recommendation by Steve T. Cliff. (bes, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: 1) The #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plf be DENIED; 2) This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plf's failure to pay the full filing and administrative fees upon initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/20/2020. (bes, ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Declaration, #2 Affidavit) (imm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Smith, filed by Steve T. Cliff. (Attachments: #1 Formal Complaint)(imm, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less