This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:50:37 (UTC).

Clevenger v. Metropolitan Huntington, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Clevenger filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Metropolitan Huntington, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward Clevenger

Defendants

Metropolitan Huntington, LLC

Metropolitan Huntington, LLC an Ohio limited liabilty company doing business as Pullman Square

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason P. Foster

Attorney at THE SEGAL LAW FIRM

810 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Scott S. Segal

Attorney at THE SEGAL LAW FIRM

810 Kanawha Boulevard, East

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant Attorneys

Kelly Calder Mowen

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

99 Cracker Barrel Drive

Barboursville, WV 25504

Edward A. Smallwood

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO

420 Fort Duquesne Boulevard, Suite 600, One Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC, edward Clevenger. (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 5/17/2020 to add party filer) (ts).

#11

(#11) REPLY by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to #9 Response In Opposition. (Mowen, Kelly)

#10

(#10) REPLY by Edward Clevenger to #8 Response In Opposition. (Foster, Jason)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE by Edward Clevenger in opposition to #7 MOTION by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Foster, Jason)

8 #2

Exhibit 2

8 #1

Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) RESPONSE by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC in opposition to #5 MOTION by Edward Clevenger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mowen, Kelly)

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) MOTION by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mowen, Kelly)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7576390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC, edward Clevenger. (Mowen, Kelly) (Modified on 5/17/2020 to add party filer) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to #9 Response In Opposition. (Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY by Edward Clevenger to #8 Response In Opposition. (Foster, Jason)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE by Edward Clevenger in opposition to #7 MOTION by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Foster, Jason)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC in opposition to #5 MOTION by Edward Clevenger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC to Amend #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Edward Clevenger in support of #5 MOTION by Edward Clevenger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Foster, Jason)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Edward Clevenger to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County (Foster, Jason)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 5/13/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/26/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/1/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 6/15/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 6/22/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 6/29/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 3/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Metropolitan Huntington, LLC (Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC.(Mowen, Kelly)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Metropolitan Huntington, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7576390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason P. Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott S. Segal