This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2022 at 07:47:53 (UTC).

Cleveland Clinic et al v. Xavier Becerra

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 Cleveland Clinic filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Xavier Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02648

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLEVELAND CLINIC

Paradise Valley Hospital

Encino Hospital Medical Center

Glendora Oaks Behavioral Health Hospital

Garden Grove Hospital & Medical Center

West Anaheim Medical Center

Huntington Beach Hospital

La Palma Intercommunity Hospital

Chino Valley Medical Center

San Dimas Community Hospital

Desert Valley Hospital

Centinela Hospital Medical Center

Sherman Oaks Hospital

Alvarado Hospital Medical Center

Montclair Hospital Medical Center

Shasta Regional Medical Center

INDIAN RIVER MEDICAL CENTER

Southern Regional Medical Center

The Queen's Medical Center

North Hawaii Community Hospital

170 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan J Sedley

Attorney at Alan J. Sedley Law Corporation

18880 Douglas, Suite 404

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Clinic, identifying None. (Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

#14

(#14) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra, Civil Process Clerk. (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#13

(#13) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra., U.S Attorney General (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#12

(#12) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complain, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

11 #3

Summons Amended Comp. 03

11 #2

Summons Amended Comp. 02

11 #1

Summons Amended Comp. 01

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr:This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambersstaff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-00989 TJH(JPRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02648 TJH(JPRx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Clinic, identifying None. (Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra, Civil Process Clerk. (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra., U.S Attorney General (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complain, #11 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. (shb) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Xavier Becerra amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Cleveland Clinic (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Comp. 01, #2 Summons Amended Comp. 02, #3 Summons Amended Comp. 03)(Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr:This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambersstaff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-00989 TJH(JPRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John D. Early and Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02648 TJH(JPRx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra, U.S. Attorney General, Civil Process Clerk (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 Civil Process Clerk) (sh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff CLEVELAND CLINIC. (Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff CLEVELAND CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 summons request, #2 summons request, #3 summons request)(Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33163401 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff CLEVELAND CLINIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Alan J Sedley added to party CLEVELAND CLINIC(pty:pla))(Sedley, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH HAWAII COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALVARADO HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Shasta Regional Medical Center is a litigant