This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 09:15:19 (UTC).

Clemons v. Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Clemons filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Walter P Rawl Sons, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shiva V Hodges and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00285

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shiva V Hodges

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Clemons

Defendant

Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darrious Lamar Baker

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

1320 Main Street, Suite 750

Columbia, SC 29201

Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr

Attorney at Dickey Law Group LLC

440 Center Street

West Columbia, SC 29169

Defendant Attorneys

C Frederick W Manning, II

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips

Po Box 11612

Columbia, SC 29211

Nicole Paul Cantey

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips

Po Box 11612

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 3/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/29/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/1/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/28/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/27/2021, Discovery due by 8/27/2021, Motions due by 9/13/2021, ADR Statement due by 10/11/2021, Mediation Due by 11/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 3/4/2021. (lbak) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Michelle Clemons.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Michelle Clemons.(Dickey, Joseph) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc..(Cantey, Nicole) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cantey, Nicole) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc..(Cantey, Nicole) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 3/8/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/29/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/1/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/28/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/28/2021, Discovery due by 8/27/2021, Motions due by 9/13/2021, ADR Statement due by 10/11/2021, Mediation Due by 11/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/1/2021. (lbak) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc..(Cantey, Nicole) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc.. (lbak) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Lexington Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-32-00078. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9617129), filed by Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walter P. Rawl & Sons, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Daniel Dickey, Jr.