This case was last updated from PACER on 10/09/2021 at 08:03:29 (UTC).

Clemons v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 Clemons filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vernon Clemons

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

Dylan Boigris

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary St, Suite 307

Miami, FL 33133

Laura Pereira

Attorney at The Downs Law Group, P.A.

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (cjr) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Order, #3 Authorization) (cjr) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-00753. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 10/5/2021.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dylan Boigris terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 9/1/2021. (caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Dylan Boigris as Attorney by Vernon Clemons. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boigris, Dylan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Laura Pereira for Vernon Clemons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/5/2021. (caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that, no later than 9/3/2021, plaintiffs Braulio Lemus-Hernandez, Vernon Lee Clemons, and Ronald O. Gomez must provide full and complete initialdisclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiff and their counsel must appear before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(v). FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline by which Braulio Lemus-Hernandez, Vernon Lee Clemons, and Ronald O. Gomez must submit a venue filing is extended to no later than 10/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2021. (NEF: Sect J) Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2021.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Laura Pereira by Vernon Clemons. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Durkee, Charles) Modified text on 8/5/2021 (bw). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8815679) filed by Vernon Lee Clemons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Dylan Boigris added to party Vernon Lee Clemons(pty:pla).(Boigris, Dylan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/8/2021.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dylan Boigris