This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2020 at 07:23:28 (UTC).

Clemmons v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 Clemmons filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00268

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Clemmons

Defendant

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick Ward Kramer

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd.

Minnetonka, MN 55305

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7413771) filed by Sarah Clemmons. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kramer, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarah Clemmons. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Kramer, Patrick) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarah Clemmons. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada waiver sent on 1/21/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Kramer, Patrick) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-268 (SRN/DTS). (lmb) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7413771) filed by Sarah Clemmons. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kramer, Patrick) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.