This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2021 at 08:57:19 (UTC).

Clemente v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 Clemente filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian M. Cogan and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05813

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian M. Cogan

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elsie Clemente

Defendant

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Feinstein

Attorney at Feinstein & Feinstein

61 Broadway, Ste 2820

New York, NY 10006

Defendant Attorneys

William Howard Yost, III

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10009

Justin Thomas Nastro

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar LLP

80 Pine Street, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter Joint Letter to Judge Cogan by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Feinstein on behalf of Elsie Clemente (notification declined or already on case) (Feinstein, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Thomas Nastro on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 12/23/2020 at 12:00 pm. To participate in the call, the parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. The parties are ordered to comply with the attached mandatory requirements, including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/1/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Yost, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Response to Supplemental Demand

1 #2

Exhibit B- Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 510734/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13765516) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Response to Supplemental Demand) (Yost, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 2/9/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/13/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held on 12/23/2020 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Both sides present by telephone. Discovery is to proceed as follows: plaintiff to provide all medical authorizations by 12/30/2020; parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 01/11/2021; serve written discovery requests by 01/25/2021; produce discovery by 02/24/2021; complete depositions by 03/26/2021, the end of fact discovery. The last day for filing a letter requesting a pre-motion conference to file dispositive motions shall be 04/02/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter Joint Letter to Judge Cogan by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Feinstein on behalf of Elsie Clemente (notification declined or already on case) (Feinstein, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Thomas Nastro on behalf of Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 12/23/2020 at 12:00 pm. To participate in the call, the parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. The parties are ordered to comply with the attached mandatory requirements, including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/1/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Vanguard Group for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Yost, William) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 510734/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-13765516) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer, #3 Exhibit C-Response to Supplemental Demand) (Yost, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2020) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less