This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 08:56:36 (UTC).

Cleary v. Avature Limited

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Cleary filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Avature Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04368

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Cleary

Defendant

Avature Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL D. HOMANS

Attorney at HOMANS PECK LLC

1835 Market Street, Suite 1050

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avature Limited, filed by William Cleary.(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Cleary re: Stephen M. Vitale served Summons and Complaint upon Avature Limited by Summons in a Civil Action. Avature Limited served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Avature Limited.(HOMANS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Avature Limited.(HOMANS, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Avature Limited. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 11/2/21 (amas, ) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Cleary re: Stephen M. Vitale served Summons and Complaint upon Avature Limited by Summons in a Civil Action. Avature Limited served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Avature Limited, filed by William Cleary.(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Avature Limited. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/6/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Cleary. (JL ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Avature Limited ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15454575.), filed by William Cleary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Homans