This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2023 at 17:22:20 (UTC).

Clear Blue Energy Corp. v. School District No. 1

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 Clear Blue Energy Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against School District No 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and Christine M. Arguello. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00251

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clear Blue Energy Corp.

Defendants

School District No.1

Denver Public Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerome M. Joseph

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit B

#3

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Suit With Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff Clear Blue Energy Corp. (Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/17/21 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/12/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against School District 1, in the City and County of Denver a/k/a Denver Public Schools (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7687482)Attorney Jerome M. Joseph added to party Clear Blue Energy Corp.(pty:pla), filed by Clear Blue Energy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Joseph, Jerome) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less