This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:12:27 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02964

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendants

THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY

KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorney

Previn Warren

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Declaration of Greg O'Neil

#10

(#10) Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (The Kraft Heinz Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) filed by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg O'Neil)(Warren, Previn) Modified event docket/text on 12/7/2020 (eg). (Entered: 12/07/2020)

9 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal

9 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Pittman, John) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 21, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Previn Warren on behalf of KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY (Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE / Supplement - Original State Court Complaint by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

#3

(#3) ERRATA by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Case File, #5 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Case File

1 #2

Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003806 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7718767 filed by THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Case File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court (The Kraft Heinz Company's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) filed by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Greg O'Neil)(Warren, Previn) Modified event docket/text on 12/7/2020 (eg). (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Pittman, John) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Remand due by 11/16/2020. Response due by 12/7/2020. Reply due by 12/21/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' #5 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be filed by November 16, 2020. Defendant's Response shall be filed by December 7, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply shall be due by December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 21, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 21, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Previn Warren on behalf of KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY (Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE / Supplement - Original State Court Complaint by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, (Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ERRATA by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY #1 Notice of Removal, filed by KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Case File, #5 Amended Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY (Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003806 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7718767 filed by THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment of Service, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Case File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warren, Previn) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kraft Heinz Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Previn Warren