This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:08:23 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ketanji Brown Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03154

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ketanji Brown Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendants

THE HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.

HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Julie T. Oliver-Zhang

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JULIE OLIVER-ZHANG, LLC

810 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Defendant Attorney

A. Wolfgang McGavran

Attorney at MCGUIREWOODS LLP

2001 K St, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 Hackman v. One Brands Complaint

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 Toxin Free USA v. Smuckers Complaint (selected pages)

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Courtesy Copy of Plaintiff CLP's Complaint

#10

(#10) REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Courtesy Copy of Plaintiff CLP's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Toxin Free USA v. Smuckers Complaint (selected pages), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Hackman v. One Brands Complaint)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A (Proposed Order)

#9

(#9) Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(McGavran, A.) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to D.

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A with corrected cover sheet

8 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to Plaintiff's Motion to Rema

#8

(#8) ERRATA by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to D.C. Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A with corrected cover sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to D.C. Superior Court)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavran, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie T. Oliver-Zhang on behalf of CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/5/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Courtesy Copy of Plaintiff CLP's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Toxin Free USA v. Smuckers Complaint (selected pages), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Hackman v. One Brands Complaint)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(McGavran, A.) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ERRATA by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to D.C. Superior Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A with corrected cover sheet, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to D.C. Superior Court)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule is set in this matter: Plaintiff's motion to remand is due on or before 11/30/2020; Defendant's opposition thereto is due on or before 12/21/2020; and Plaintiff's reply in further support thereof is due on or before 1/4/2021. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is STAYED until further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/20/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGavran, A.) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie T. Oliver-Zhang on behalf of CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/5/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC. (McGavran, A.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003607 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7780927 filed by THE HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGavran, A.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HAIN CELESTIAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Travis Pittman