Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 11:52:24 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. PHARMAVITE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against PHARMAVITE LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul L. Friedman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03846

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Friedman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendant

PHARMAVITE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorney

Mark H. M. Sosnowsky

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

1500 K Street, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005-1209

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 joint motion to extend deadlines in light of mediation. Neither party shall engage in litigation activity unless notice is filed in writing on or before March 4, 2021; defendant shall respond to first amended complaint on or before March 4, 2021; and plaintiff shall file its motion for remand on or before March 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2021. (MA) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by PHARMAVITE LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. M. Sosnowsky on behalf of PHARMAVITE LLC (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (adh, ) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#3

(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PHARMAVITE LLC (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PHARMAVITE LLC. Case related to Case No. 2:20-cv-8001 (C.D. Cal.). (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Documents from Superior Court (Docket and Remaining Documents)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Documents from Superior Court (Proof of Service)

1 #3

Exhibit C - Documents from Superior Court (First Amended Complaint)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Documents from Superior Court (Order)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Documents from Superior Court (Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020-CA-003912-B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8014817 filed by PHARMAVITE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents from Superior Court (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B - Documents from Superior Court (Order), #3 Exhibit C - Documents from Superior Court (First Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D - Documents from Superior Court (Proof of Service), #5 Exhibit E - Documents from Superior Court (Docket and Remaining Documents), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/4/2021, Notice due by 3/4/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 joint motion to extend deadlines in light of mediation. Neither party shall engage in litigation activity unless notice is filed in writing on or before March 4, 2021; defendant shall respond to first amended complaint on or before March 4, 2021; and plaintiff shall file its motion for remand on or before March 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 8, 2021. (MA) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by PHARMAVITE LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark H. M. Sosnowsky on behalf of PHARMAVITE LLC (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (adh, ) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to mark.sosnowsky@faegredrinker.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Attorney is provisional. Please renew your membership. See https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-and-renewal-information. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PHARMAVITE LLC (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PHARMAVITE LLC. Case related to Case No. 2:20-cv-8001 (C.D. Cal.). (Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020-CA-003912-B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8014817 filed by PHARMAVITE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents from Superior Court (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B - Documents from Superior Court (Order), #3 Exhibit C - Documents from Superior Court (First Amended Complaint), #4 Exhibit D - Documents from Superior Court (Proof of Service), #5 Exhibit E - Documents from Superior Court (Docket and Remaining Documents), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sosnowsky, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Travis Pittman