This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2021 at 08:11:27 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is John D. Bates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John D. Bates

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

280 E. 1St Ave

Broomfield, CO 80038

Defendant

NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.

244 Knollwood Dr.

Bloomington, IL 60108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorney

Richard J. Oparil

Attorney at ARNALL GOLDEN GREGORY LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

(#13) REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Oparil on behalf of NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 3/17/2021. (tb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #15 the consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's reply in support of its motion to remand shall be filed by not later than March 17, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/3/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in opposition to re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 2/19/2021. Response due by 2/24/2021. (tb) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #12 the stipulation and order extending time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be filed by not later than February 19, 2021, and defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to remand shall be filed by not later than February 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/11/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 2/12/2021. (tb) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/13/2021. (tb) (Entered: 01/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #6 the stipulation and order extending time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's answer or other response shall be filed by not later than January 13, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/8/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION and Order Extending Time by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Travis Pittman on behalf of CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Pittman, John) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Oparil on behalf of NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. (Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from D.C. Superior Court, case number 2020 CA 004013 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-8033417 filed by NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oparil, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NOW HEALTH GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard J. Oparil