This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2021 at 08:46:09 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. NEW CHAPTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against NEW CHAPTER, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03381

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendant

NEW CHAPTER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Soukup

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

Henry Ben-Heng Liu

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

Virginia A Williamson

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Pittman, John) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia A Williamson on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Williamson, Virginia) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Ben-Heng Liu on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Liu, Henry) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Soukup on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Case File

1 #2

Exhibit Proof of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003771 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7862568 filed by NEW CHAPTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit State Court Case File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand by January 29, 2021; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its reply February 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/13/2021. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Pittman, John) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/21/2020. Responses due by 1/15/2021 and Replies due by 2/5/2021. Answer due by 1/11/2021. (lsj) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Briefing Schedule. The Court hereby enters the following briefing schedule:Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is deferred pending this Court's resolution of Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to remand; Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be filed on or before December 21, 2020; Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand shall be filed on or before January 15, 2021; Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion to remand shall be filed on or before February 5, 2021; If this Court denies Plaintiff's motion to remand, Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed within 30 days following any order denying Plaintiff's motion to remand. If Plaintiff does not timely file a motion to remand, Defendant's responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed on or before January 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/27/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia A Williamson on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Williamson, Virginia) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Ben-Heng Liu on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Liu, Henry) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Soukup on behalf of NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW CHAPTER, INC. (Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003771 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7862568 filed by NEW CHAPTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit State Court Case File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Soukup, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Travis Pittman