This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2021 at 07:54:05 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed an Other lawsuit against MEAD JOHNSON COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tanya S. Chutkan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03231

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya S. Chutkan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendant

MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie T. Oliver-Zhang

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JULIE OLIVER-ZHANG, LLC

810 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20037

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Jeremy Baratz

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Mary Buckley

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

227 West Monroe St., Ste 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Anthony J. Anscombe

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

227 West Monroe St., Ste 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order to file Complaint as Separate ECF filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibits 1 & 2 in Support of Motion to Remand

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 & 2 in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Buckley on behalf of MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Buckley, Mary) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Anscombe, Anthony) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Declaration of Lia Metreveli

#7

MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Lia Metreveli may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiffs, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/1/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie T. Oliver-Zhang on behalf of CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order to file Complaint as Separate ECF filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 & 2 in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Separate complaint due by 12/18/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: By 12/18/2020 Plaintiff shall file a copy of the Complaint as a separate ECF entry. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/15/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Buckley on behalf of MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Buckley, Mary) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Anscombe on behalf of MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Anscombe, Anthony) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Lia Metreveli may be heard in open court on behalf of Plaintiffs, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/1/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Granting #6 #8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anthony J. Anscombe and Mary E. Buckley are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Pro hac applicants who seek admission more than twice within two years are highly encouraged to become members of the Bar for this court. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/1/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 12/16/2020; Defendant's Response due by 1/8/2021. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/22/2021. (jth) (Entered: 11/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part Joint Motion #9 for Extension of Deadlines. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due 12/16/2020. Defendant's Response due 1/08/2021. Plaintiff's Reply to due 1/22/2021. Defendant's obligation to respond to the Complaint is hereby stayed pending further order of the court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/20. (DJS) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule on Motion for Remand, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mary E. Buckley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7833814. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mary E. Buckley, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lia Metreveli, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7833200. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lia Metreveli, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony J. Anscombe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7833129. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Anscombe, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jeremy Baratz on behalf of MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (adh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie T. Oliver-Zhang on behalf of CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION (Oliver-Zhang, Julie) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC (Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2020 CA 003713 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7813190 filed by MEAD JOHNSON & COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant