Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2021 at 07:53:46 (UTC).

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION v. GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03229

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION

Defendant

GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorneys

John David Cella

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Lori B. Leskin

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC. (Leskin, Lori) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Leskin on behalf of GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Leskin, Lori) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

8 #20

Exhibit 20

8 #19

Exhibit 19

8 #18

Exhibit 18

8 #17

Exhibit 17

8 #16

Exhibit 16

8 #15

Exhibit 15

8 #14

Exhibit 14

8 #13

Exhibit 13

8 #12

Exhibit 12

8 #11

Exhibit 11

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

6 #1

Declaration of Lori B. Leskin

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lori B. Leskin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7817668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori B. Leskin)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC. (Leskin, Lori) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION. (Pittman, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Leskin on behalf of GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Leskin, Lori) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Attorney Lori B. Leskin is admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/2/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/30/2020. (tj) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lori B. Leskin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7817668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori B. Leskin)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Attachments: #1 Consent Motion Proposed Order)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit A)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal (zmd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC (Cella, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, Civil Division, case number 2020 CA 003753 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7813081 filed by GARDEN OF LIFE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cella, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAN LABEL PROJECT FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori Blake Leskin