This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:12:48 (UTC).

Clayton v. USA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Clayton filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Kays and Prisoner Pro Se. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00658

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

Referral Judge

Prisoner Pro Se

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Montez L Clayton

Pine Knot, KY 42635

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Ashleigh Anna Ragner

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office-KCMO

400 E 9Th Street, Suite 5510

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOVANT'S REPLY to Doc. #8 filed by Montez L Clayton.(Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#8

(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of Respondent USA. Reply suggestions due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ragner, Ashleigh) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of USA (Attorney Ashleigh Anna Ragner added to party USA(pty:res))(Ragner, Ashleigh) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that Respondent answer Movant's allegations and show cause on or before September 16, 2020, why the relief Movant seeks should not be granted. Signed on August 17, 2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00958. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall TRANSFER the instant motion to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentence to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (Case to be transferred after 8/11/2020.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/28/2020. (SMM) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB) (JAB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Montez L. Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form) (DLB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOVANT'S REPLY to Doc. #8 filed by Montez L Clayton.(Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER that Movant file a reply to the Government's response (Doc. 8) by October 14, 2020. Signed on September 14, 2020, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McCoy, Mike) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of Respondent USA. Reply suggestions due by 9/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Ragner, Ashleigh) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of appearance by Ashleigh Anna Ragner on behalf of USA (Attorney Ashleigh Anna Ragner added to party USA(pty:res))(Ragner, Ashleigh) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that Respondent answer Movant's allegations and show cause on or before September 16, 2020, why the relief Movant seeks should not be granted. Signed on August 17, 2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00958. (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Tue Jul 28 14:46:07 CDT 2020 (Marshall, Sean) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall TRANSFER the instant motion to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentence to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (Case to be transferred after 8/11/2020.) Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/28/2020. (SMM) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Fri Jul 24 11:46:30 CDT 2020 (Bernsen, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Clark enters a Standing Order in all of his cases as follows: See Order for details #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/judge/stephen-r-clark (JAB) (JAB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jul 24 09:00:54 CDT 2020 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Montez L. Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form) (DLB). [Transferred from moed on 8/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less