Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2020 at 08:49:02 (UTC).

Clayton v. Rhoades

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 Clayton filed an Other lawsuit against Rhoades. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Celeste F. Bremer and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00080

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Celeste F. Bremer

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Clayton

Denver, CO 80205

Defendant

Jana Rhoades

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion. Pursuant to Local Rules 5A(c), Plaintiff's request to participate in the Court's Electronic Case Filing system is granted. Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk of Court to obtain the login material. She may not permit this login or password to be utilized by any other person. In addition to the Local Rules, Plaintiff is responsible for complying with the ECF Procedures Manual and any other requirements contained in this Manual and on the Court's webpage: www.iasd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2020. (mlr) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

5 #1

Contact Information

#5

(#5) MOTION to Use Electronic Filing System. by Mary Clayton.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/7/2020. Updated contact information and time stamped copy given to plaintiff at front door. (Attachments: #1 Contact Information) (kjw) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of re #1 Complaint, by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jana Rhoades., filed by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

1 #4

Online Contract Arbitration

1 #3

Affidavit

1 #2

Writ

1 #1

Supporting documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jana Rhoades, filed by Mary Clayton. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents, #2 Writ, #3 Affidavit, #4 Online Contract Arbitration) (kjw) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion. Pursuant to Local Rules 5A(c), Plaintiff's request to participate in the Court's Electronic Case Filing system is granted. Plaintiff shall contact the Clerk of Court to obtain the login material. She may not permit this login or password to be utilized by any other person. In addition to the Local Rules, Plaintiff is responsible for complying with the ECF Procedures Manual and any other requirements contained in this Manual and on the Court's webpage: www.iasd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer on 4/28/2020. (mlr) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Use Electronic Filing System. by Mary Clayton.Motions referred to Celeste F. Bremer. Responses due by 5/7/2020. Updated contact information and time stamped copy given to plaintiff at front door. (Attachments: #1 Contact Information) (kjw) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of re #1 Complaint, by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jana Rhoades., filed by Mary Clayton. (kjw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jana Rhoades, filed by Mary Clayton. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 6/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents, #2 Writ, #3 Affidavit, #4 Online Contract Arbitration) (kjw) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less