This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 07:02:00 (UTC).

Clayton v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Clayton filed an Other lawsuit against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07275

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Clayton

Defendant

Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Todd Michael Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Adrian R. Bacon

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rodney Clayton (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

4 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13856441.). Filed byRodney Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rodney Clayton (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2020 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13856441.). Filed byRodney Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.