This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 07:32:05 (UTC).

Clayton v. Fowlerville School District et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Clayton filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Fowlerville School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurie J. Michelson and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-12325

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Justin T. Clayton

Fowlerville, MI 48836

Kasandra Henderson

Fowlerville, MI 48836

J.D.C.

8598 Cass River Rd.

Fowlerville, MI 48836

Defendants

Fowlerville School District

Wayne Roedel

Livingston Educational Service Agency

Rob Dorner

Bobby Sue Adams

Jason Miller

Kelly Miller

Mike Brown

Brad Lusk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Attachment 1

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Attachment

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/29/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2022 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#7

(#7) SHOW CAUSE filed by Justin Clayton. (TTho) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER Dismissing State FOIA Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Justin T. Clayton against All Defendants. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #11 Directing Service by the US Marshal on All Plaintiffs at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Justin T. Clayton against All Defendants. (NAhm) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #8 Order Dismissing Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint on Justin T. Clayton at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Dismissing State FOIA Claim and Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SHOW CAUSE filed by Justin Clayton. (TTho) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order to Show Cause on Justin T. Clayton at 8598 Cass River Rd, Fowlerville, MI 48836. (EPar) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 10/25/2022 Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Western District of Michigan. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docket Sheet from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00690. Modified on 9/30/2022 (VLun). (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff Justin T. Clayton (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) [Transferred from miwd on 9/30/2022.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFERREDCOMPLAINT against Fowlerville School District, Wayne Roedel filed by Justin T. Clayton (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:22-cv-00690.] (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis M. Comstock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J Mullins