This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:14:17 (UTC).

Clayton v. Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Clayton filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02096

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Clayton

Defendants

Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc.

Paul Watkins

Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher George Wilhelmi

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Ashley Webber

Thomas William Carroll

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #5

Summons

#3

3 #1

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #3

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#5

#6

#7

#8

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2020 is vacated. However, the parties are still required to submit their proposed scheduling order and consent form on or before 9/21/2020 in accordance with the #5 Order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/10/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas William Carroll on behalf of Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC, Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc., Paul WatkinsAttorney Thomas William Carroll added to party Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas William Carroll added to party Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas William Carroll added to party Paul Watkins(pty:dft) (Carroll, Thomas) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Ashley Webber on behalf of Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC, Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc., Paul WatkinsAttorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Paul Watkins(pty:dft) (Webber, Erin) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amanda Clayton. Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc. waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020; Paul Watkins waiver sent on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/28/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 9/21/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/20/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Dreamstyle Remodeling of Colorado, LLC, Dreamstyle Remodeling, Inc., Paul Watkins (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7392330)Attorney Christopher George Wilhelmi added to party Amanda Clayton(pty:pla), filed by Amanda Clayton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less