This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:42 (UTC).

CLAYTON v. C. R. BARD, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 CLAYTON filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R BARD, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian R. Martinotti and Edward S. Kiel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17059

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian R. Martinotti

Referral Judge

Edward S. Kiel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN D. CLAYTON

Defendants

C. R. Bard

BARD PERIPHERAL VASULAR, INC. (a subsdiary and/or division of defendant C.R. BARD, INC.)

C. R. BARD, INC.

BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYJES MATTHEW SHAH

Attorney at THE MILLER FIRM LLC

108 Railroad Avenue

Orange, VA 22960

Defendant Attorneys

ANDREW J. ROSENZEIG

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

DAVID J. COONER

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07101

ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN

Attorney at MCCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

100 Mulberry Street, Four Gateway Center

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC..(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

13 #3

Text of Proposed Order

13 #4

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. ROSENZEIG on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (ROSENZEIG, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew E. Brown, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/9/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference is set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Newark -Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/17/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

13 #2

Certification of Matthew E. Brown, Esq.

#8

(#8) Letter from David J. Cooner, Esq. to Honorable Edward S. Kiel re Adjournment of Initial Conference. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BARD PERIPHERAL VASULAR, INC. (a subsdiary and/or division of defendant C.R. BARD, INC.), C. R. Bard ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912254) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALLEN D. CLAYTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, TAYJES) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Brown, Esq.) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, Esq., #2 Certification of Matthew E. Brown, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (MONAHAN, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

13 #1

Certification of David J. Cooner, Esq.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW J. ROSENZEIG on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (ROSENZEIG, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew E. Brown, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/9/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Matthew E. Brown, Esq.) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Cooner, Esq., #2 Certification of Matthew E. Brown, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER: The Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby adjourned to 10/31/2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Please mark your calendar accordingly. The teleconference shall be initiated by the plaintiff such that the plaintiff will arrange for all parties to be on one line before calling into Chambers. If the parties plan to utilize a dial-in teleconference service, the dial-in information shall be transmitted to Chambers by email to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least two business days before the teleconference. The parties must submit a joint letter, at least three days before the conference, advising of the status of discovery and any other issues to be addressed. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/4/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ORDER: The Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby adjourned to 10/11/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Please mark your calendar accordingly. The teleconference shall be initiated by the plaintiff such that the plaintiff will arrange for all parties to be on one line before calling into Chambers. If the parties plan to utilize a dial-in teleconference service, the dial-in information shall be transmitted to Chambers by email to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least two business days before the teleconference. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/2/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#10) TEXT ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/9/2019 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Please mark your calendar accordingly. The teleconference shall be initiated by the plaintiff such that the plaintiff will arrange for all parties to be on one line before calling into Chambers. If the parties plan to utilize a dial-in teleconference service, the dial-in information shall be transmitted to Chambers by email to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least two business days before the teleconference. The Court's Case Management Order can be found at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/CaseManagementOrder.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/1/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM is hereby adjourned to 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Courts form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 10/1/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from David J. Cooner, Esq. to Honorable Edward S. Kiel re Adjournment of Initial Conference. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER: The initial conference scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 2:00 PM is hereby adjourned to 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. The parties shall submit a proposed Joint Discovery Plan as a Word document, to ESK_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than three business days before the scheduled initial conference. The Court's form Joint Discovery Plan may be found at www.njd.uscourts.gov/content/edward-s-kiel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/18/2019. (as, ) Modified on 9/19/2019 (as, ). (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER ORDER: An in-person initial scheduling conference is set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Newark -Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel on 9/17/2019. (as, ) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH KATHERINE MONAHAN on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC. (MONAHAN, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. (COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC..(COONER, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC., C. R. BARD, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BARD PERIPHERAL VASULAR, INC. (a subsdiary and/or division of defendant C.R. BARD, INC.), C. R. Bard ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912254) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ALLEN D. CLAYTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHAH, TAYJES) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.