This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 12:15:23 (UTC).

Clayton et al v. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Clayton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry T. Wingate and LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00183

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

Referral Judge

LaKeysha Greer Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramona Clayton

Charles Clayton

Defendants

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Does One Through Five

Walmart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronnie Leigh Walton

Attorney at GLOVER, YOUNG, HAMMACK, WALTON, & SIMMONS, PLLC

P. O. Drawer 5514, 1724A 23Rd Avenue (39301)

Meridian, MS 39302-5514

Kacey G. Bailey

Attorney at GLOVER, YOUNG, HAMMACK, WALTON, & SIMMONS, PLLC

P. O. Drawer 5514, 1724A 23Rd Avenue (39301)

Meridian, MS 39302-5514

Defendant Attorneys

Rajita Iyer Moss

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Thomas M. Louis

Attorney at WELLS, MARBLE & HURST, PLLC - Ridgeland

P. O. Box 131 (Jackson - 39205-0131), 300 Concourse Blvd., Suite 200

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Walmart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 11/18/2021 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/17/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/21/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/20/2021; Motions due by 12/2/2021 ; Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 4/1/2022, Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/20/21 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party. Walmart Stores East, LP added. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust terminated. The Clerk shall make all necessary changes on the docket to reflect the substitution of WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP as the proper party in interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/9/2021 (BB) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey G. Bailey on behalf of Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Bailey, Kacey) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#5

(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Moss, Rajita) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #5

Exhibit D - Process, pleadings, etc. served on Walmart

1 #4

Exhibit C - Pl's NOS Responses to RFA

1 #3

Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to RFA

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Walmart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Discovery due by 11/18/2021 ; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2021; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 5/17/2021; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 8/21/2021; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 9/20/2021; Motions due by 12/2/2021 ; Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 4/1/2022, Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/20/21 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/16/2021. Participants: Ronnie Leigh Walton, Kacey Bailey and Thomas Louis. The court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party. Walmart Stores East, LP added. Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust terminated. The Clerk shall make all necessary changes on the docket to reflect the substitution of WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP as the proper party in interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/9/2021 (BB) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Walton, Ronnie) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kacey G. Bailey on behalf of Charles Clayton, Ramona Clayton (Bailey, Kacey) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) State Court Record by Defendant Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Moss, Rajita) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Louis, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Caroline Johnson on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust (Johnson, J.) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following dial-in number for the conference call. Dial-in #:(888) 684-8852; Passcode: 3566012 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust from Lauderdale County Circuit Court, case number 20CV149(BB). ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4500886) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response to RFA, #4 Exhibit C - Pl's NOS Responses to RFA, #5 Exhibit D - Process, pleadings, etc. served on Walmart)(PG) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronnie Leigh Walton