This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 11:02:50 (UTC).

Clay v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Clay filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacia Russell Clay

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Farah F. Gheith

827 Saint Louis St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Spencer H. Calahan

827 St. Louis Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Charles L. Chassaignac, IV

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson - BR

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Eleanor Weeks Wall

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel, & Johnson -BR

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Justin Murphy DeLaune

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson

301 St. Charles Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Emily Stickney Morrison

Attorney at Porteous Hainkel & Johnson

408 North Columbia Street

Covington, LA 70433-2920

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Attachment Order

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave to FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Remand

#12

(#12) MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Remand)(Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/19/2019) (ELW). Modified on 6/19/2019 replaced as ordered by rec doc 13 (ELW). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Stacia Russell Clay. (Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

8 #1

Attachment Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Strike 6 Motion to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

7 #3

Attachment Order

7 #2

Exhibit Petition

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Parties, Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Demand

1 #1

Attachment A -State Court Pleadings

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave to FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#14) Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending Motion to Remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 3:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. An Amended Joint Status Report shall be filed by 8/8/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(SGO) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The Clerk shall substitute R. Doc. 12-1 in the place of R. Doc. 11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 11) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Remand)(Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/19/2019) (ELW). Modified on 6/19/2019 replaced as ordered by rec doc 13 (ELW). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Stacia Russell Clay. (Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Strike 6 MOTION to Remand. R. Doc. 6 shall be struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Strike 6 Motion to Remand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Strike 6 Motion to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) Modified on 5/29/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: 6 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Attachment Order)(Gheith, Farah) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (#6) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Remand by Stacia Russell Clay. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Petition)(Gheith, Farah) Modified on 5/30/2019 to remove document as it has been stricken in accordance with RD 9 (SWE). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 04:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Parties, Copies of Pleadings and Service in Compliance with 28 USC Section 1447 (b) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-681008. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1934890), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff's Demand, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Chassaignac, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.