This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:38:22 (UTC).

Claunch v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Claunch filed a Government Benefit - Veteran lawsuit against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Veteran

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin D. Claunch

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Defendants

United States Government

United States Department of Veterans Affairs

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Government (Originally received by the court on 07/17/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kevin D. Claunch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (jl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/20/2020. (jl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Government (Originally received by the court on 07/17/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kevin D. Claunch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (jl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 08/20/2020. (jl) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 07/17/2020) filed by Plaintiff Kevin D. Claunch. (jl) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less