This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 09:31:40 (UTC).

Clarke v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Clarke filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21163

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Clarke

Defendants

Rex Medical, Inc. doing business as Rex Medical, L.P.

Rex Medical, L.P.

Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph R. Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson, P.A.

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Joseph R Johnson

Attorney at Babbitt & Johnson, P.A.

1641 Worthington Road, Suite 100

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Defendant Attorney

Jordan Scott Cohen

Attorney at Wicker Smith O'Hara McCoy & Ford

515 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1400 Suntrust Center

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. waiver sent on 4/25/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Cohen, Jordan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Scott Cohen on behalf of Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. Attorney Jordan Scott Cohen added to party Argon Medical Devices, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cohen, Jordan) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc., Rex Medical, Inc., Rex Medical, L.P.. (pcs) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14556049, filed by Michael Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGON MEDICAL DEVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Scott Cohen