This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:35:30 (UTC).

Clark v. Whaley et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Clark filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Whaley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas R. Cole. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00300

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALYSON CLARK

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Brent Whaley

Ryna Saylor

Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.

Kelly Richardson

Ryan Saylor

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Kelly Richardson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Craig Shipp

Attorney at Wallace Boggs, PLLC

300 Buttermilk Pike, Suite 100

Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Daniel T Downey

Attorney at Fishel, Hass, Kim & Albrecht Downey, LLP

7775 Walton Parkway, Suite 200

New Albany, OH 43054

Jay Richard Langenbahn

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame - 1

312 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Jay Richard Langenbahn

Attorney at Lindhorst & Dreidame - 1

312 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kelly Richardson on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Ryan Saylor, Brent Whaley filed by Kelly Richardson. (Langenbahn, Jay) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7474894) of Scott A. Best by Plaintiff Alyson Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ryan Saylor on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brent Whaley on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Downey for Defendants Ryan Saylor, Brent Whaley (Downey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Alyson Clark re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7423953), filed by ALYSON CLARK. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kelly Richardson on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Ryan Saylor, Brent Whaley filed by Kelly Richardson. (Langenbahn, Jay) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7474894) of Scott A. Best by Plaintiff Alyson Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ryan Saylor on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brent Whaley on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Downey for Defendants Ryan Saylor, Brent Whaley (Downey, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Plaintiff Alyson Clark re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7423953), filed by ALYSON CLARK. (Shipp, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Richard Langenbahn