This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 07:38:37 (UTC).

Clark v. Wexford Health Sources et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Clark filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Wexford Health Sources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01695

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramon Clark

Chicago, IL 60624

Defendants

Wexford Health Sources

Vipin Shah

David Poor

Josh Lane

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ramon Clark.(jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ramon Clark. (jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 12/16/2021. Consent due by 1/6/2022 (jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ramon Clark. (jaj) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Plaintiff shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 1/13/2022 (jaj) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#10

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#9) Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 7.02 received, receipt number 34625111178 (jlh) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE: Plaintiff was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Plaintiff shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 1/13/2022 (jaj) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#7) Docket Annotation - Scanning Lawrence terminated this date as to electronic transmissions. (jaj) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ramon Clark. (jaj) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $7.02. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Robinson Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/22/2021. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 21-1695-SPM. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/16/2021. (jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 12/16/2021. Consent due by 1/6/2022 (jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ramon Clark. (jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ramon Clark.(jaj) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant