This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:36:39 (UTC).

CLARK v. WALMART STORES EAST, LP

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 CLARK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART STORES EAST, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and James R. Sweeney II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01339

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNA CLARK

Defendant

WALMART STORES EAST, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip D. Olsson

Attorney at KEN NUNN LAW OFFICE

104 South Franklin Rd.

Bloomington, IN 47404

Defendant Attorney

Katherine S. Strawbridge

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK, Witness List , filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#14

(#14) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on June 8, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 27, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021. Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/8/2020.(SWM) Modified on 6/10/2020 (SWM). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP . (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE , re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip D. Olsson on behalf of Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Submission of State Court Record from Johnson County in case number 41D01-2004-CT-000066. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/11/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by WALMART STORES EAST, LP.(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

1 #3

State Court Record (Court Docket, Plaintiffs Appearance, Complaint for Damages,

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1: Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Superior Court, case number 41D01-2004-CT-000066, filed by WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5984847) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record (Court Docket, Plaintiffs Appearance, Complaint for Damages, Summons to Walmart, and Return of Service for Walmart))(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Exhibit List , filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK, Witness List , filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 07/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Regarding Discovery Disputes. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/9/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Entry and Order from Initial Pretrial Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for an initial pretrial conference on June 8, 2020, with the magistrate judge. The case management plan submitted in this case is approved as modified by the magistrate judge in the margins of the case management plan. This case is set for a telephone status conference on August 27, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the courts electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (JLS) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021. Discovery due by 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/8/2020.(SWM) Modified on 6/10/2020 (SWM). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP . (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE , re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip D. Olsson on behalf of Plaintiff ANNA CLARK. (Olsson, Phillip) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submission of State Court Record from Johnson County in case number 41D01-2004-CT-000066. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 5/11/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by WALMART STORES EAST, LP.(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S. Strawbridge on behalf of Defendant WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson Superior Court, case number 41D01-2004-CT-000066, filed by WALMART STORES EAST, LP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5984847) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Record (Court Docket, Plaintiffs Appearance, Complaint for Damages, Summons to Walmart, and Return of Service for Walmart))(Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine S. Strawbridge