This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:24:39 (UTC).

Clark v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Other case was filed by Clark against Social Security Administration, Commissioner in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01365

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Clark

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 9/9/2019, answer due 12/8/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service via USMS. (BJL) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Lynn Clark. (BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Lynn Clark.(BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 9/9/2019, answer due 12/8/2019. (BJL) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk for service via USMS. (BJL) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motion is RIPE 8/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Lynn Clark. (BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner filed by Lynn Clark.(BJL) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.