This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2021 at 08:36:00 (UTC).

Clark v. Phillips et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Clark filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Phillips. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles J. Siragusa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06926

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles J. Siragusa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy Clark

Defendants

C.O. Scott Phillips

Sgt. W. Adam, Jr.

C.O. S. Wood

C.O. Collin Devlin

C.O. Mark Docteur

C.O. Keith Matson

C.O. Jim Wasicki

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Sivin

Attorney at Sivin & Miller, LLP

20 Vesey Street, Suite 1400

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

4 #6

Summons Executed upon Wood

4 #5

Summons Executed upon Devlin

4 #4

Summons Executed upon Matson

4 #3

Summons Executed upon Wasicki

4 #2

Summons Executed upon Docteur

4 #1

Summons Executed upon Adam, Jr.

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Clark. W. Adam, Jr. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Collin Devlin served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Mark Docteur served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Keith Matson served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Scott Phillips served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Jim Wasicki served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; S. Wood served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed upon Adam, Jr., #2 Summons Executed upon Docteur, #3 Summons Executed upon Wasicki, #4 Summons Executed upon Matson, #5 Summons Executed upon Devlin, #6 Summons Executed upon Wood)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to W. Adam, Jr., Collin Devlin, Mark Docteur, Keith Matson, Scott Phillips, Jim Wasicki, S. Wood. (JD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

2 #5

Summons to Devlin

2 #4

Summons to Matson

2 #3

Summons to Wasicki

2 #1

Summons to Adam, Jr.

#2

(#2) Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Adam, Jr., #2 Summons to Docteur, #3 Summons to Wasicki, #4 Summons to Matson, #5 Summons to Devlin, #6 Summons to Wood)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against W. Adam, Jr., Collin Devlin, Mark Docteur, Keith Matson, Scott Phillips, Jim Wasicki, S. Wood $ 400 receipt number 0209-4033912, filed by Jeremy Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Clark. W. Adam, Jr. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Collin Devlin served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Mark Docteur served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Keith Matson served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Scott Phillips served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Jim Wasicki served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; S. Wood served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed upon Adam, Jr., #2 Summons Executed upon Docteur, #3 Summons Executed upon Wasicki, #4 Summons Executed upon Matson, #5 Summons Executed upon Devlin, #6 Summons Executed upon Wood)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to W. Adam, Jr., Collin Devlin, Mark Docteur, Keith Matson, Scott Phillips, Jim Wasicki, S. Wood. (JD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Adam, Jr., #2 Summons to Docteur, #3 Summons to Wasicki, #4 Summons to Matson, #5 Summons to Devlin, #6 Summons to Wood)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against W. Adam, Jr., Collin Devlin, Mark Docteur, Keith Matson, Scott Phillips, Jim Wasicki, S. Wood $ 400 receipt number 0209-4033912, filed by Jeremy Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Sivin Esq.