This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2022 at 08:51:22 (UTC).

Clark v. National Credit Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Clark filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against National Credit Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00753

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leon Clark

Defendants

National Credit Systems, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Indian Creek Apartments

First Choice, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip Wesley Pool

Shawn Jaffer

Allen Edgar Robertson

Robert Leach

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Bowdich

Austin Krist

Timothy Cleveland

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16304738), filed by Leon Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leach, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Clark. (Jaffer, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney John W. Bowdich added to party National Credit Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) by National Credit Systems, Inc..(Bowdich, John) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by National Credit Systems, Inc.. (Bowdich, John) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

09/09/2022

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Indian Creek Apartments answer due 9/28/2022. (jv2) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Indian Creek Apartments shall file an answer or response to plaintiff's complaint on or before September 28, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lolc) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Indian Creek Apartments. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krist, Austin) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Parties by National Credit Systems, Inc.. (Bowdich, John) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney John W. Bowdich added to party National Credit Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) by National Credit Systems, Inc..(Bowdich, John) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Leon Clark. (Jaffer, Shawn) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022

DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leon Clark. (dl) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022

DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (dl) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16304738), filed by Leon Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leach, Robert) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less