This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2021 at 08:33:18 (UTC).

Clark v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 Clark filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01483

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ivan L.R. Lemelle

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shaante Clark

Shaante Quinesha Clark

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Cross Claimants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing

International Paper Company

Union Carbide Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.

CSR, Ltd

Insurance Company of North America

St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Westchester Fire Insurance Company

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Northrup Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.

Northrup Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Industries, Inc.

Avondale Shipyards, Inc

Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.

Hopeman Brothers Inc

Defendants and Cross Defendants

International Paper Company

Union Carbide Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.

Insurance Company of North America

St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company

Westchester Fire Insurance Company

Hopeman Brothers Inc

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Ryan Cannella

Attorney at Baron & Budd

909 Poydras Street, Ste 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Benjamin David Rumph

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70112

Christopher C. Colley

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C. (Baton Rouge)

2600 Citiplace Drive, Suite 400

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Kristopher Lynn Thompson

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

3102 Oak Lawn Ave, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Cross Claimant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alexander R Saunders

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

David Wayne O'Quinn

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kaye N. Courington

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Blaine Augusta Moore

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mathilde Villere Semmes

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Nathan Bell

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Daniel S Roberts

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kaye N. Courington

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Blaine Augusta Moore

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Brittney Bullock Ankersen

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Mathilde Villere Semmes

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Nathan Bell

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

23 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

53 #1

Proposed Order

#53

#52

#51

#50

49 #1

Proposed Order

#49

43 #1

Proposed Order

#21

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Alison A. Spindler by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ANSWER to #21 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Crossclaim,, by Uniroyal Inc.Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Inc(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER GRANTING #49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Amber L. Stewart is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for defendant International Paper Company in the above-captioned matter and shall be removed from receiving notification of filings through CM/ECF in this matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/10/2021. (pp) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER GRANTING #43 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. The submission date for plaintiff's motion to remand set for 9/29/2021 is hereby CONTINUED to 10/13/2021. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.5, defendants' opposition to the motion is due no later than 10/5/2021. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/10/2021.(pp) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 9/10/2021 (pp). (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. David W. O'Quinn is hereby ENROLLED as additional counsel of record for defendant Huntington Ingalls, Inc. in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/9/2021. (pp) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Dismiss Party. All matters involving defendant Century Indemnity Company in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021. (pp) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Substitute Motion to Dismiss, Exhibit and Order. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021. (pp) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION to Dismiss Party St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company . All matters involving defendant St. Paul in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021.(pp) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER GRANTING #18 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Westchester. All matters involving defendant Westchester Fire Insurance Company in the above-captioned case are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party bearing its own cost. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 9/8/2021.(pp) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Hopeman Brothers Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 8/10/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **This document was filed in error and will be noted as such. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified linkage to reflect link to Notice of Removal on 8/9/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **ERROR- See correct document rec doc 7** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jalenak, Jay) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **DEFICIENT** ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Hopeman Brothers Inc..Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DIRECTIVE of the Court pursuant to 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. By the Clerk.(jeg) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney incorrectly submitted documents that were not properly redacted. Corrected documents subsequently provided to Clerk and images have been replaced. Please ensure to comply with local rules regarding redaction on all future pleadings.** (jeg) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish, case number 819-203 Div M (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8982857) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Attachment 5 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/6/2021) (jeg). Modified text on 8/6/2021 (jeg). (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Huntington Ingalls Industries Incorporated is a litigant