This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 09:18:23 (UTC).

Clark Law Group, PLLC v. Henderson, et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Clark Law Group, PLLC filed an Other lawsuit against Henderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cristina D. Silva and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00666

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cristina D. Silva

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clark Law Group, PLLC

Defendants

Denise Henderson

Las Vegas, NV 89128

American Medical Response, Inc.

Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center

Fremont Emergency Services, Inc.

Radiology Specialists, LTD.

Advanced Orthopedics & Sports Medicine

Orthopedic Foot and Ankle Institute LLC

Thomas & Bigler Knee and Soulder Institute

Medical Neurology Chang, LTD

ATI Physical Therapy

Sunset Ridge Surgery Center, LLC

Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services

Anthem Blue Cross Life & Health Insurance Company

Meridian Resource Company, LLC

Anesthesiology Consultants, Inc.

Healing Hearts Home Care

Healthcare Partners Medical Group Coats LTD

Radar Medical Group

Ming Wei Wu, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clifton Jared Clark

Attorney at Clark Law Group, PLLC

6655 W Sahara Ave Ste A212

Las Vegas, NV 89146

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Hanson, II

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office -- District of Nevada

501 Las Vegas Blvd., Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Christopher Chiou

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

501 Las Vegas Blvd. S., Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/22/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/7/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of United States by Defendant Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Hanson, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Stipulation of Dismissal. It is hereby ordered that the United States, named in this action as Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services, be dismissed from this action, and the matter be remanded to state court for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of order and docket mailed to state court - HAM) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Denise Henderson. Address: 7632 Pacific Hills Ave., #104Las Vegas, NV 89128 (HAM) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Denise Henderson. Address: 7632 Pacific Hills Ave., #104Las Vegas, NV 89128 (HAM) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Stipulation of Dismissal. It is hereby ordered that the United States, named in this action as Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services, be dismissed from this action, and the matter be remanded to state court for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy of order and docket mailed to state court - HAM) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of United States by Defendant Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Hanson, Stephen) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/22/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/7/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-21-829753-C, by Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Hanson, Stephen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meridian Resource Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND SPORTS MEDICINE INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where Fremont Emergency Services (Mandavia), Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant