This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:04:09 (UTC).

Clark-Fortunat v. Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Clark-Fortunat filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven M. Gold and Eric N. Vitaliano. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03525

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven M. Gold

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chantel Clark-Fortunat

Defendant

Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell David Paul

Attorney at Berger & Montague P.C.

1622 Locust St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Application Granted. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Chantel Clark-Fortunat ("Plaintiff) hereby provides notice of the dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiffs individual claims against Defendant Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. ("TURSS"), without an award of fees or costs to any partyPlaintiff further provides notice of the dismissal without prejudice of the class claims asserted against TURSS, without an award of fees or costs to any party. The Clerk is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/09/2019) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chantel Clark-Fortunat (Paul, Russell) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11576708 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Chantel Clark-Fortunat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Paul, Russell) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Application Granted. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Chantel Clark-Fortunat ("Plaintiff) hereby provides notice of the dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiffs individual claims against Defendant Trans Union Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. ("TURSS"), without an award of fees or costs to any partyPlaintiff further provides notice of the dismissal without prejudice of the class claims asserted against TURSS, without an award of fees or costs to any party. The Clerk is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/09/2019) c/m (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chantel Clark-Fortunat (Paul, Russell) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Transunion Rental Screening Solutions, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11576708 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Chantel Clark-Fortunat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Paul, Russell) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less